Financial history CARERS TRUST MID YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1069331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.89m £1.87m £2.16m £2.09m £2.09m
Total expenditure £2.01m £1.77m £1.97m £2.10m £2.27m
Income from government contracts £1.29m £1.49m £1.53m £1.82m £188.18k
Income from government grants N/A £57.30k £23.96k £42.13k £64.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.24k £4.57k £6.29k £49.56k £73.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £135 £1.40k £2.63k £6.68k
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.78m £2.11m £2.02m £1.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.20k £14.67k £15.25k £21.04k £22.41k
Income - Other £23.23k £19.03k £3.14k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.01m £1.75m £1.97m £2.10m £2.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £19.45k £23.20k £24.67k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £25.46k £0 £0 £0