THE FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY RAYLEIGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Activities of this charity are to raise funds for the Parochial Church Council of Rayleigh specifically for the maintenance and beautification of the fabric of the ancient church of Holy Trinity, Rayleigh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 02 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE BROWN | Chair | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Glen Robert Mansfield | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Robert William Simmonds | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Reginald Gale | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.03k | £11.47k | £88.33k | £38.87k | £123.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.99k | £18.15k | £20.06k | £95.38k | £23.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 10TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
(1) THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE CHURCH OF HOLY TRINITY RAYLEIGH AND TO ANCILLARY CHURCH BUILDINGS. (2) TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE ABOVE CHURCH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCH BEING MADE REDUNDANT OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
HOLY TRINITY RAYLEIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAYLEIGH PARISH OFFICE
RECTORY GARTH
RAYLEIGH
SS6 8BB
- Phone:
- 01268742151
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window