ETLOE EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preach the gospel of God and advance the Christian faith, serving the community under God's guidance, in a spiritual and practical way. To worship God and provide fellowship for all believers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 29 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART ALAN SIMMONS | Chair | 03 December 1997 |
|
|||||||||
Roy Turner | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.97k | £5.25k | £7.37k | £5.45k | £5.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.83k | £3.65k | £4.21k | £8.00k | £6.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 DECEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BY SERVING THE COMMUNITY IN A SPIRITUAL AND PRACTICAL WAY, TO FURTHER THE KINGDOM OF HEAVEN UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF GOD THE FATHER, GOD THE SON AND GOD THE HOLY SPIRIT; AND TO BUILD UP THE SPIRITUAL LIFE OF THE BELIEVERS AND ALL WHO ATTEND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 CONISTON AVENUE
BRISTOL
BS9 3SA
- Phone:
- 01179624220
- Email:
- s@stewartsimmons.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window