THE MEMORIAL ARTS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity enables Britain's long tradition of fine lettercarving to flourish by running an Apprenticeship Scheme and Workshops in letter-design and letter-carving. We founded the Art & Memory Collection.in 2009 - sixty-three lettered works now at 7 venues across the UK. We also run a Help & Advice service for people wishing to commission unique memorials and other lettered commemorative works.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 September 1998: Standard registration
- 10 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1148638 THE LETTERING & COMMEMORATIVE ARTS TRUST
- MEMORIALS BY ARTISTS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 27 October 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 2 NOVEMBER 1998 AND 17TH MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF ARTS AND CRAFTS ASSOCIATED WITH MEMORIALS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window