The Meadows Day Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of day care services for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,175 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 March 1998: Standard registration
- THE JOHN VAN GEEST DAY CENTRE (Working name)
- AGE CONCERN SPALDING DISTRICT (Previous name)
- AGE UK SPALDING DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK WILLIAM SKELLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Brenda Kay Ruysen | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Barzycki | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Christopher Cronin | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Elliott | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Franklin | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Jeffery | Trustee | 16 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.47k | £148.99k | £156.97k | £204.90k | £231.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.24k | £184.73k | £207.95k | £216.05k | £231.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £38.53k | N/A | £14.90k | £22.30k | £39.17k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £94.42k | £22.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/11/2011 as amended on 24 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND SPALDING
Area of benefit
SPALDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 THE MEADOWS
SPALDING
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE11 1XR
- Phone:
- 01775720305
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window