Financial history SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1069304
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.94k £6.62k £12.38k £10.59k £17.15k
Total expenditure £5.33k £5.02k £17.90k £10.72k £16.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A