Financial history HAY FESTIVAL FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1070073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £427.49k £166.88k £4.69m £5.39m £6.37m
Total expenditure £185.41k £45.85k £4.63m £5.09m £5.97m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £213.09k £261.58k £801.38k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £976.03k £245.58k £389.67k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £3.71m £5.12m £5.94m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.20k £16.30k £36.78k
Income - Other N/A N/A £5.22k £8.84k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £4.63m £5.09m £5.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £6.75k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £241.36k £11.18k £56.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0