OUSEBURN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ouseburn Trust aims to deliver succesful regeneration of the Ouseburn Valley through four objectives: Achieving continuity through heritage interpretation and other activities; Increasing assets, encouraging enterprise and improving income generation for the Trust and others, Increasing community participation through volunteering and other actions; A continuous internal improvement programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,899 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 20 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Marie Graham | Chair | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Christopher Dancer | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
STUART MICHAEL DEXTER | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Parkins | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Knight | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Francis | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Slack | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dale Bolland | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.04k | £242.10k | £316.95k | £293.96k | £327.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.73k | £248.43k | £230.60k | £306.26k | £353.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £70.00k | £26.59k | N/A | £11.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/07/2011
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR LOWER OUSEBURN VALLEY, BOUNDED BY THE RIVER TYNE TO THE SOUTH, WARWICK STREET TO THE NORTH, NEWINGTON ROAD, ELIZABETH STREET, METRO LINE AND DISUSED RAILWAY LINE TO THE EAST AND CRAWHALL ROAD AND STODDART STREET TO THE WEST) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDING OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE (II) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS (III) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES (IV) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT (V) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE (VI) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING (VII) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES (VIII) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME (IX) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (X) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT (B) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Lime Street
Ouseburn Valley
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01912616596
- Email:
- admin@ouseburntrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window