HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A local development agency, which exists to promote, develop & support community & voluntary action in Hyndburn & Ribble Valley and surrounding areas Aims are to: Assist the positive development of local groups. Maximise local group involvement in regeneration,health & social welfare initiatives Facilitate liaison between local groups and other organisations Promote co-ordinated effort.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £223,120 from 4 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 July 1998: Standard registration
- HYNDBURN & RIBBLE VALLEY CVS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Rose | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Hughes | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Keysell Swarbrick | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Allan Clements | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH HELEN ADDISON Miss | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Zulekha Dala | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.84k | £593.94k | £383.74k | £467.88k | £236.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.90k | £541.37k | £404.02k | £440.85k | £253.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £223.12k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £79.93k | £187.08k | £434.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £246.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £347.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £59 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £541.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £182.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/06/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (HERE IN AFTER CALLED ‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’) AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES, BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICTS OF HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 5
The Chambers
Town Hall Square
Great Harwood
BB6 7DD
- Phone:
- 01254888614
- Email:
- mail@hrv-cvs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window