GREAT TEW SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils of Great Tew School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 July 1998: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Gordon Field | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
LUCY MILES | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE GWYNETH BENNETT | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Nicholas JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.99k | £15.28k | £8.99k | £6.10k | £450 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.43k | £18.75k | £0 | £0 | £11.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JUNE 1998. as amended on 11 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF GREAT TEW SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GREAT TEW SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Tew School
The Green
Great Tew
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 4DB
- Phone:
- 01608683642
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window