THE ENDOWMENT FUND OF THE SCHOOLS OF QUEEN ELIZABETH THE FIRST, BARNET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants for educational purposes are given to individuals and, in the form of Special Purpose Grants, to the two Queen Elizabeth's Schools. Please note that individual beneficiaries of the charity must be students who are about to attend, are attending or have attended the schools of Queen Elizabeth the First, Barnet. They must be under 25.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
Governance
- 11 May 1998: Standard registration
- Q E ENDOWMENT FUND BARNET (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTYN HENRY STEWART BRADISH | Chair |
|
||||||||
Giuliano Pietro Eugenio Gregori | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Revd Samuel Benjamin Stuart Rossiter-Peters | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
ALAN EUGENE SOLOMON | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|||||||
SUSAN PAMELA CASWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS VOULLA DEMETRI | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ERIC HOUSTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID JOHN PERKINS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS WENDY PRENTICE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
GILLIAN MYRA WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.92k | £83.33k | £33.86k | £44.13k | £44.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.60k | £87.15k | £11.59k | £84.93k | £38.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSION DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 APR 2021
Charitable objects
APPLICATION OF INCOME OF THE BOYS' ENDOWMENT:- THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY UP TO 80% OF THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE BOY'S ENDOWMENT IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT PROVIDED FROM PUBLIC FUNDS FOR THE QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GRANT MAINTAINED BOYS SCHOOL, BARNET AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS. THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND YOUNG MEN UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-FIVE YEARS WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED THE SAID BOYS SCHOOL AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; (B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ASSIST WITH THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS OR TO TRAVEL TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION; (C) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BENEFICIARIES. APPLICATION OF INCOME OF THE GIRLS' ENDOWMENT:- THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY UP TO 80% OF THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE GIRLS' ENDOWMENT IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE QUEEN ELIZABETH'S COUNTY MAINTAINED SCHOOL FOR GIRLS, BARNET AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS. THE RESIDUE OF THE SAID NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-FIVE YEARS WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED THE GIRLS SCHOOL AND ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; (B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ASSIST WITH THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS OR TO TRAVEL TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION; (D) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BENEFICIARIES. DISCRETIONARY FUND WHERE A BEQUEST OR DONATION IS RECEIVED, AND IT IS NOT DESIGNATED AS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BOYS’ ENDOWMENT OR THE GIRLS’ ENDOWMENT SUCH MONIES SHALL BE CREDITED TO THE DISCRETIONARY FUND. THE NET INCOME AFTER DEFRAYING THE DIRECT COSTS OF THE DISCRETIONARY FUND SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THE MANNER AND FOR THE OBJECTS PRESCRIBED IN CLAUSES 26 TO 31 OF THE SCHEME OF 3 FEBRUARY 1998 SAVE THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE SOLE DISCRETION IN APPLYING THAT INCOME IN WHATEVER PROPORTIONS, IF ANY, THAT THEY SHALL DECIDE TO THE BENEFIT OF THE BOYS OR GIRLS AND SHALL NOT BE BOUND BY THE PERCENTAGES SET OUT IN CLAUSES 27, 28, 30 OR 31 OF THE SCHEME OF 3 FEBRUARY 1998.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Homefield Road
WARE
SG12 7NG
- Phone:
- 01920 484382
- Email:
- pgyates19@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window