Financial history BARROW FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1069681
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £70.31k £52.75k £69.55k £119.66k £110.00k
Total expenditure £61.44k £101.88k £270.92k £208.79k £59.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A