THE CLAUDIA JONES ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PARENTAL AND FAMILY INVOLVEMENT SUPPORT, VIOLENCE AGAINST WOMEN AND GIRLS SERVICES,THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS, ADULTS, INTERGENERATIONAL MUSIC, HEALTH AND WELLBEING ACTIVITIES, CULTURAL AND HERITAGE ACTIVITIES, COUNSELLING FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN, ADVOCACY AND POLICY DEVELOPMENT, , SOCIAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL SUPPORT FOR WOMEN OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £176,629 from 6 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 10 November 1999: Standard registration
- C.J.O. (Working name)
- CJO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Efua Louisa Augustine-Fraser | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Marle | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Millicent Isola Reid | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Clarisse Fanny Bipat | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abeke Phillips | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Corinth Mingo | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Kirwan | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDIA PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.96k | £382.74k | £212.64k | £190.62k | £212.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.99k | £217.86k | £292.54k | £275.22k | £220.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £79.53k | £8.00k | £32.96k | £157.68k | £176.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH JULY 1999
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION PRIMARILY OF AFRO-CARIBBEAN WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN IN HACKNEY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF AFRO-CARIBBEAN WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISABILITY AMONG THE COMMUNITY OF HACKNEY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLAUDIA JONES ORGANISATION
103 STOKE NEWINGTON ROAD
LONDON
N16 8BX
- Phone:
- 02072411646
- Email:
- info@claudiajones.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window