PAPYRUS PREVENTION OF YOUNG SUICIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PAPYRUS helpline , HOPELINE247 Telephone 0800 068 41 41, provides information and practical advice to any young person who is feeling suicidal and to anyone who is worried that a young person they know may be suicidal. PAPYRUS also produces suicide prevention information and resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,617,690
Donations and legacies | £2.43m | |
Charitable activities | £1.28m | |
Other trading activities | £1.84m | |
Investments | £64.19k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,447,661
Raising funds | £473.37k | |
Charitable activities | £4.97m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £56,600 from 3 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £473.37k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.97m | |
Retained for future use | £170.03k |
People

103 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
750 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 August 1998: Standard registration
- 13 February 2024: Funds received from 1184922 LAUREN'S PLACE
- PAPYRUS (Working name)
- PAPYRUS (PREVENTION OF SUICIDES) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARRY JOHN HESKETH BIGGS-DAVISON | Chair | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ludo Henry Poultney | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Smith | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annessa Rebair | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Airey | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Phoebe Olivia Torrance | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Gemma Bowen | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Denny | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Fitchett | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17m | £2.83m | £4.37m | £4.50m | £5.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76m | £2.73m | £3.76m | £4.61m | £5.45m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.98k | £35.18k | £224.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £655.03k | £1.27m | £1.39m | £2.00m | £2.43m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.78m | £942.34k | £1.58m | £1.52m | £1.84m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £730.37k | £614.92k | £1.05m | £950.37k | £1.28m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.01k | £8.11k | £10.94k | £31.74k | £64.19k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £344.06k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £14.84k | £14.10k | £110.69k | £60.01k | £793.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.62m | £2.55m | £3.43m | £4.28m | £4.97m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £141.96k | £183.65k | £327.59k | £326.26k | £473.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £45.00k | £33.70k | £18.52k | £34.54k | £51.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.01m | £2.10m | £2.86m | £2.82m | £3.10m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £86.94k | £86.66k | £232.91k | £299.37k | £410.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 JUNE 1998, 7 OCTOBER 2000 AND 20TH NOVEMBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 APR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECT OF SUICIDE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CONCERNING YOUNG PEOPLE TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE PREVENTION OF SUICIDE BY YOUNG PEOPLE, AND WHERE POSSIBLE, TO OFFER ASSISTANCE TO THEM, THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR THEIR CARERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PAPYRUS Prevention Of Young Suicide
2 Bankside
Crosfield Street
WARRINGTON
WA1 1UP
- Phone:
- 01925572444
- Email:
- admin@papyrus-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window