THE GILLIAN CAMPBELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Conwy
Governance
- 26 March 2001: Standard registration
- THE GILLIAN CAMPBELLL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Charles Salisbury | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.30k | £56.24k | £12.71k | £9.06k | £10.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.98k | £20.80k | £11.33k | £119.40k | £121.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 8TH DECEMBER 2000, ALTERING TRUST DEED 18TH DECEMBER 1958.
Charitable objects
A) IN THE PAYMENT OF ALL OR PART OF THE FEES PAYABLE IN RESPECT OF GIRLS WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO BE OR REMAIN AT RYDAL PENCHOS ("THE COLLEGE"). B) IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OR SUPPORT OF ANY SUCH GIRLS AS LAST AFORESAID. C) IN THE PAYMENT OF ALL OR ANY PART OF THE FEES NECESSARY TO BE PAID IN RESPECT OF ANY GIRL WHO ON LEAVING THE COLLEGE WISHES TO CONTINUE HER STUDIES IN A MANNER APPROVED OF BY THE TRUSTEES AND WHO BUT FOR THE HELP OF THE GILLIAN CAMPBELL TRUST WOULD IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BE UNABLE TO DO SO. D) IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OR SUPPORT OF ANY SUCH FORMER COLLEGE GIRL DURING SUCH A PERIOD OF FURTHER STUDY AFORESAID AND SO THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT BE CONCERNED AS TO THE APPLICATION OF ANY SUCH MONEYS GRANTED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF THIS SUB- CLAUSE.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
RYDAL PENRHOS
PWLLYCROCHAN AVENUE
COLWYN BAY
LL29 7BT
- Phone:
- 01492532728
- Email:
- finance@rydalpenrhos.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window