THE NATIONAL GAS MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Gas Museum Trust was established in 1997 and owns a collection of c4,000 artefacts connected with the history and contemporary practice of the gas industry. The collection has been described as the most comprehensive and important of its kind and traces the industry's evolution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JON BUTTERWORTH MBE | Chair | 13 December 2010 |
|
|
||||
Howard Neil Forster | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Baljit Dhillon | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oliver Carpenter | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Stephen Michael Richardson | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|||||
DEAN BERRY | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRITLAND HORNE MIGASC | Trustee | 23 March 1999 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £577 | £1.00k | £0 | £9 | £1.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £518 | £505 | £359 | £509 | £363 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHARITY AS A MUSEUM AND TO HOLD EXHIBITIONS OF A HISTORICAL NATURE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 28
LEICESTER
LE2 7QH
- Phone:
- 01162503190
- Email:
- nationalgasmuseum@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window