Financial history THE FERRY PROJECT

Charity number: 1075389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.79m £1.42m £1.51m £2.08m £2.15m
Total expenditure £1.36m £1.36m £1.54m £1.80m £2.16m
Income from government contracts £217.61k £276.24k £243.09k £198.63k £592.85k
Income from government grants £168.62k N/A £268.70k £532.00k £99.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £21.31k £230.70k £258.40k £315.06k £17.58k
Income - Other trading activities £610.00k £116.06k £126.16k £75.18k £77.10k
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.07m £1.07m £1.68m £2.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17 £9 £47.03k £12.95k £308
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.15m £1.47m £1.79m £2.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £251.42k £208.67k £69.42k £12.49k £2.16k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £54.01k £59.58k £48.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0