JACOB'S WELL (DERBY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restore is the name under which the Charity's principally project operates, providing outreach and drop in services for vulnerable women. The project offers opportunity for change and support for those women who are at a point of desiring change. We work closely with partners to support those considered most vulnerable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 21 September 1998: Standard registration
- JACOB'S WELL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON JOHN SHAW | Chair | 17 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Alasdair Stuart Kay | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON JOHN CARTWRIGHT | Trustee | 16 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GWYN GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.69k | £20.49k | £40.68k | £22.02k | £14.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.76k | £16.80k | £24.11k | £26.42k | £24.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | N/A | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH (C) TO PROVIDE ADVICE, COUNSEL, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY MENTAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, OR EMOTIONAL ILLNESS OR DISTRESS (D) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF HELP AND ADVICE TO PERSONS IN NEED IN RELATION TO WELFARE BENEFITS, DEBT AND PERSONAL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT, ACCOMMODATION AND HOMELESSNESS AND SIMILAR MATTERS (E) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
CITY OF DERBY AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Thomas Church
149 Pear Tree Road
Derby
DE23 8NQ
- Phone:
- 07716017084
- Email:
- finance@restorederby.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window