RAMBLERS HOLIDAYS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to charities which promote walking, protect public rights of way and those which provide opportunities for disadvantaged children and adults to enjoy, understand and appreciate the beauty of the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 June 1998: Standard registration
- Ramble Worldwide Outdoor Trust (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeff Sissons | Chair | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Edgerton | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Declan Michael Dwyer | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Cooper | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Duxbury | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.25k | £90.12k | £92.19k | £91.80k | £99.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.66k | £265.94k | £29.85k | £27.46k | £63.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST IN: (1) THE PROVISION AND PROTECTION OF FOOTPATHS AND OTHER WAYS OVER WHICH THE PUBLIC HAVE A RIGHT OF WAY OR ACCESS ON FOOT. (2) THE PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE BEAUTY OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND OTHER AREAS WHICH ARE PROVIDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH LAWFUL MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY ENCOURAGING THE PUBLIC TO PROVIDE AND PRESERVE PUBLIC ACCESS TO LAND ON FOOT. (3) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AND THE ORGANISING OF WALKING AND OTHER OUTDOOR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE INTENDED, NAMELY THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE. (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO ACCESS TO, AND THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF, THE COUNTRYSIDE, AND OF THE HEALTH BENEFITS OF OUTDOOR RECREATIONAL PURSUITS. THE TRUSTEES MAY FURTHER THE OBJECTS PARTICULARLY BY HELPING ALL PERSONS TO A GREATER KNOWLEDGE, LOVE AND CARE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND URBAN OPEN SPACES, AND BY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION IN WALKING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Swan Close
Deighton
York
York
County (optional)
YO19 6HY
- Phone:
- 01904 720233
- Email:
- michaelduxbury@rhct.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window