ANGLO LATIN AMERICAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation, also known as ALAF, is a company limited by guarantee. Members are eleven Anglo Latin American friendship societies (e.g. Anglo Chilean Society, British Mexican Society etc.). ALAF's main function is the organisation of events at which the members raise funds for childrens' charities in Latin America.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 October 1998: Standard registration
- ALAF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard James Austen MBE | Chair | 21 March 2015 |
|
|||||
DAMARIS ALBARRAN | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Maria Teresa Nemes | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fabiana Jaramillo | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Andres Monsalve | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Froehlich | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE BELL | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ELIZABETH PATERAS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52k | £1.39k | £7.64k | £9.24k | £8.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.85k | £6.20k | £2.74k | £6.57k | £6.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN GENERALLY WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE COUNTRIES OF LATIN AMERICA AND 2. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE COUNTRIES OF LATIN AMERICA, THEIR PEOPLE, GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, LANGUAGE, INSTITUTIONS, CULTURE, MUSIC, FOLKLORE AND ALSO THE INTELLECTUAL, ARTISTIC AND ECONOMIC LIFE OF THOSE COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LATIN AMERICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODLAND HOUSE
ST. HELIER ROAD
SANDRIDGE
ST. ALBANS
AL4 9LQ
- Phone:
- 01727850599
- Email:
- damaris.albarran@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window