CITY OF HULL AND HUMBER ENVIRONMENT FORUM (CHEF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Forums Training Advice Services Survey work Recycling Consultations Publications Consultancy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 April 1999: Standard registration
- CHEF (Working name)
- THE CITY OF HULL ENVIRONMENT FORUM (CHEF) (Working name)
- CITY OF HULL ENVIRONMENT FORUM (CHEF) (Previous name)
- CITY OF HULL ENVIRONMENTAL FORUM (CHEF) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN DEANE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM RIGBY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.30k | £24.12k | £5.88k | £1.01k | £2.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.98k | £21.39k | £5.31k | £2.61k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.10k | £12.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 APRIL 1999 AND 7 MAY 2003, BY CERT OF INCORP UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23RD JUNE 2004 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABILITY OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENTS OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE COUNCIL, NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE COUNCIL AND NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE COUNCIL BEING UNITARY AUTHORITIES IN ENGLAND. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABILITY.
Area of benefit
HULL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Duesbery Street
HULL
HU5 3QD
- Phone:
- 07985297577
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window