OXFORDSHIRE OUTDOOR LEARNING TRUST

Charity number: 1075765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

2023 Bursaries totalled £2,485, granted to 21 young people from 7 schools/settings The bursary is 50% of the OL course cost & continues to be open to all OCC schools attending Outdoor Centres Bursaries are paid on receipt of the impact form, with comments from instructor, school staff, parents/carers & child/young person Only income was a personal donation, school cake sale & interest

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £345
Total expenditure: £1,972

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH EATON Chair
None on record
Marion Mills Trustee 05 September 2019
THE BATEMANS TRUST
Received: On time
James Watt Trustee 30 March 2017
None on record
LESLEY JOY WILLIAMS Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF COWLEY, OXFORD
Received: On time
GRAHAM JONES Trustee
OXFORD SPORTS COUNCIL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £708 £578 £2.25k £242 £345
Total expenditure £3.17k £3.38k £3.37k £1.47k £1.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 WYKEHAM CRESCENT
OXFORD
OX4 3SD
Phone:
01865779562