Accounts and annual returns ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION ATHERTON BRANCH

Charity Number: 1070253
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required