Financial history ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION ATHERTON BRANCH

Charity Number: 1070253
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £6.76k £2.34k £792 £501 £151
Total expenditure £6.04k £2.51k £612 £453 £132
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A