THE GOLSONCOTT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation's aim is to promote the arts generally and in particular the fine arts and music - the key criterion is excellence. Projects involving young people should offer a long-lasting connection between them and the art-form and a significant level of participation and achievement at a high standard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JO LIVELY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Emilio Salice | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
ELIZA THOMPSON | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Izzy Wick | Trustee | 25 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Dame PENELOPE MARGARET LIVELY DBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DR HARRIET HARVEY WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
STEVE WICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.36k | £80.28k | £87.15k | £102.81k | £110.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.06k | £74.61k | £104.06k | £98.52k | £107.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING IN THE FINE ARTS AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 ST. LEONARDS ROAD
EXETER
EX2 4LS
- Phone:
- 01392252855
- Email:
- golsoncott@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window