THE EAST COAST ELITE BRASS AND PERCUSSION CORPS

Charity number: 1070794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The East Coast Elite's mission is to provide to its members the finest musical and performing arts education available. The object of the charity is to educate the public to appreciate both Concert and Marching Band Style activities and in particular to advance the education and training of young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,608
Total expenditure: £12,813

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • North East Lincolnshire
  • North Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
J A JEX Chair 09 November 2012
None on record
Mark Bolton Trustee 10 January 2021
None on record
Maria Bolton Trustee 10 January 2021
None on record
PAMELA JEX Trustee
None on record
LEE ANTONY JEX Trustee
MARCHING & PERFORMING ARTS UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
FIONA LOUISE JEX Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.20k £2.83k £2.35k £8.74k £12.61k
Total expenditure £18.37k £6.75k £3.60k £6.94k £12.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROBERTS FARM
THIRD LANE
ASHBY-CUM-FENBY
GRIMSBY
DN37 0QU
Phone:
07912505080