Financial history BROADENING CHOICES FOR OLDER PEOPLE

Charity number: 1074954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.86m £7.66m £7.66m £7.72m £8.98m
Total expenditure £7.60m £7.30m £7.51m £8.13m £8.79m
Income from government contracts £3.25m £2.74m £3.81m £3.69m £4.19m
Income from government grants N/A £433.37k £355.59k £71.38k £41.14k
Income - Donations and legacies £62.67k £68.86k £32.67k £39.53k £34.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £14.33k £7.25k £113.53k £78.05k
Income - Charitable activities £7.75m £7.54m £7.57m £7.51m £8.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £50.64k £41.51k £44.99k £51.89k £84.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.47m £7.26m £7.45m £8.11m £8.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.16k £6.11k £5.76k £11.12k £9.18k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £68.82k £99.47k £80.39k £24.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £111.25k £30.93k £59.21k £0 £0