Financial history REVIVAL FIRES

Charity number: 1072369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £328.81k £345.66k £317.48k £367.09k £435.46k
Total expenditure £340.57k £283.54k £284.26k £373.29k £469.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A