Financial history THE JAM TRUST

Charity number: 1072159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.68k £56.08k £6.96k £13.04k £19.00k
Total expenditure £21.70k £15.54k £23.54k £22.21k £26.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A