Financial history BRIT VALLEY ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1070791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.06k £12.35k £13.88k £7.70k £8.95k
Total expenditure £10.46k £12.42k £11.18k £8.99k £10.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A