CRAI DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The merger of the three District Scout Councils of Caerphilly, Rhymney Valley and Islwyn was completed smoothly and the new CRAI District Scout Council continues to grow in Membership. The change of District Commissioner had no effect on the smooth running. The Council's may objectives to promote Scouting and the support to individal Scout Groups has been maintained and enhanced.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
162 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 02 September 1998: Standard registration
- RHYMNEY VALLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Sage | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sartha Rajoo | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Smith | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cerys Sage | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Williams | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Caroline Pitten | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edward Britt | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Terrell | Trustee | 31 December 2015 |
|
|||||
MR TERRY PAYNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.41k | £167.90k | £39.35k | £41.23k | £39.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.00k | £161.32k | £43.67k | £42.64k | £40.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE RHYMNEY VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
C R A I Activity Park
Maes yr Haf Lane
Newbridge
NEWPORT
NP11 4RX
- Phone:
- 07425153884
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window