DOWNING COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO FURTHER PUBLIC GOOD BY PROMOTING LEARNING, STUDY AND TEACHING IN A COMMUNITY OF SCHOLARS IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DOWNING COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

54 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROF GRAHAM JOHN VIRGO Chair
None on record
Dr Charlotte Christiane Hammer Trustee 05 February 2025
None on record
Dr Maria Elena Martinez-Acacio Alonso Trustee 31 January 2025
None on record
Simon Brockington Dr Trustee 04 November 2024
None on record
Dr YANG LI Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
PROFESSOR ALISON DEIRDRE JANE SCADDEN Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
PROFESSOR EMMA FRANCIS INGLIS LEES Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
DR DINO KADICH Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Giulia Maltagliati Trustee 03 May 2024
None on record
Juliana Santos de Carvalho Trustee 09 February 2024
None on record
Dr STEFANIA FIORENTINO Trustee 02 October 2023
REGIONAL STUDIES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DR RACHEL COOMBES Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
DR REBECCA FREUND Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Dr ALICE SOWTON Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Dr Bonnie Claire Lander Johnson Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Professor Helen Jane Scott Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Maria Vera Morales Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dmitrij Szamozvancev Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Francesco Muschitiello Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Robert Todd Beardwell Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Dr John William Roger Morgan Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Richard Justin Davies Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Michael Ashby Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
William Andrew Day Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Neda Farahi Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Frisbee Sheffield Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
PROF JOSEPH WEBSTER Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Joanne Finnie Jones Trustee 11 May 2018
None on record
Prof ZOE KOURTZI Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
PROF NICK RAWLINSON Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Dr Michael Crisp Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr EWAN JONES Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Dr BRENDAN PLANT Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
PROF MONICA MORENO FIGUEROA Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
DR SARAH KENNEDY Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
Dr KAMRAN YUNUS Trustee 14 February 2013
None on record
Dr TIM BURTON Trustee 12 April 2011
None on record
PROF CHRISTOPHER ALLIM HANIFF Trustee
None on record
Dr BRIGITTE STEGER Trustee
None on record
Prof GUY BARNETT WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
PROF MICHAEL TREVOR BRAVO Trustee
None on record
PROF IAN GARETH ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
PROF WILLIAM O'NEILL Trustee
None on record
PROF AMY LOUISE MILTON Trustee
None on record
Dr MARTA MORGADO CORREIA Trustee
None on record
PROF DAVID JOHN WALES Trustee
None on record
Dr DAVID ROBERT PRATT Trustee
None on record
THE REVD DR KEITH EYEONS Trustee
None on record
Prof Nicholas Coleman Trustee
None on record
Dr JIE LI Trustee
None on record
Dr NATALIA MORA-SITJA Trustee
None on record
Professor ROBERT HARLE Trustee
None on record
PROF ZOE HELEN BARBER Trustee
None on record
Dr SOPHIA DEMOULINI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.20m £10.24m £12.77m £14.43m £16.16m
Total expenditure £12.70m £12.37m £15.62m £17.95m £18.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £239.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.99m £3.00m £3.29m £2.47m £2.73m
Income - Other trading activities £1.26m £6.94k £835.48k £1.59m £1.61m
Income - Charitable activities £7.92m £7.08m £8.78m £10.12m £11.74m
Income - Endowments £881.30k £668.26k £1.29m £832.91k £1.10m
Income - Investment £913.10k £825.93k £1.15m £1.09m £1.19m
Income - Other £95 £1.36k £96 £0 £42
Income - Legacies £1.60m £1.15m £232.90k £191.61k £744.31k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.87m £10.59m £14.19m £16.66m £16.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.83m £1.78m £1.43m £1.29m £1.88m
Expenditure - Governance £93.29k £139.31k £105.50k £60.60k £84.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £51.50k £90.27k £113.90k £0 £59.18k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £160.29m £176.08m £180.51m £181.40m £198.49m
Long-term investments £65.99m £79.76m £78.30m £79.26m £81.91m
Other assets £11.99m £5.20m £3.56m £3.56m £2.36m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.58m -£1.81m -£1.94m -£1.80m -£536.05k
Total liabilities £33.62m £33.63m £33.95m £38.44m £39.16m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 11 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 16 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 02 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ESTABLISHING AND AWARDING THE JOHN MILLER SCHOLARSHIPS FOR STUDENTS OF MEDICINE AT DOWNING COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE(THE COLLEGE)TO SUCH UNDERGRADUATES FROM NON-FEE PAYING SCHOOLS ON RECOMMENDATION FROM THE COLLEGE AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 19 June 2020 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Master's Lodge
Downing College
Cambridge
CB2 1DQ
Phone:
01223 334800