THE ECTOPIC PREGNANCY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of advice to medical personnel and sufferers in the field of Ectopic Pregnancy, Miscarriage, Molar Pregnancy and Early Pregnancy Complications via a web site and help line
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 October 1998: Standard registration
- EPT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amarachukwu Bello | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Small RM FRCOG | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Williams | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Shabana Kapasi Masavi BA FIA | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM BOURNE MD, FRCOG | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PHILLIP WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.87k | £135.76k | £191.00k | £184.62k | £212.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.20k | £127.48k | £189.16k | £253.66k | £277.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/06/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO ALL PERSONS SUFFERING FROM AND AFFECTED BY THE EFFECTS OF ECTOPIC PREGNANCY, MISCARRIAGE OR MOLAR PREGNANACY. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE AWARENESS OF ECTOPIC PREGNANCY, MISCARRIAGE OR MOLAR PREGNANACY. 3. TO SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO ECTOPIC PREGNANCY, MISCARRIAGE OR MOLAR PREGNANACY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
483 GREEN LANES
LONDON
N13 4BS
- Phone:
- 02070961838
- Email:
- ept@ectopic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window