Financial history ANNA PLOWDEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1072236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £93.47k £90.22k £105.27k £113.40k £109.66k
Total expenditure £95.21k £85.44k £69.13k £96.75k £101.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A