Trustees THE CHEADLE (STAFFS) U3A
Charity Number: 1072364

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY PHILLIP SCOTT | Chair | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Alison Cunningham | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr NICHOLAS CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN BIRKS | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KEARNEY | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAE JACQUELINE PARR | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROY TERENCE HEDGES | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JOY COOKSEY | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARJ POVEY | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN CRUMP | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY MARIAN CORBISHLEY | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.