POWELLS' TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the Trust was established for general charitable purposes but has a particular interestin young people and education including Christian education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY MARK POWELL | Chair |
|
||||||
JESSICA JOAN COBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE CATRIONA CAVANAGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERONICA JOAN POWELL LRAM ARCM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.89k | £9.68k | £11.02k | £12.54k | £15.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.70k | £13.45k | £8.84k | £7.04k | £4.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND MAY (IF AND WHEN THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SO THINK FIT) PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND UNTO SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE TRUSTS FOUNDATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATE OR FOR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rumbold Farmhouse
Plaistow
BILLINGSHURST
West Sussex
RH14 0PZ
- Phone:
- 02087481771
- Email:
- mark@gm-powell.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window