THE WILTSHIRE BOBBY VAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wiltshire Bobby Van Trust provides a free home security and safety service for elderly, vulnerable and disadvantaged people in Swindon and Wiltshire. We supply and fit all locks and fittings necessary to secure the property. We carry out a full risk assessment and advise the client on best practice regarding personal and property security. We also support victims of domestic abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 December 1998: Standard registration
- 12 June 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 June 2014: Funds transferred to 1153790 THE WILTSHIRE BOBBY VAN TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.15k | £262.68k | £205.70k | £219.57k | £190.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.69k | £212.68k | £231.81k | £234.02k | £206.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 29 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 29 July 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 29 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 29 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 26 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 26 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS AND THE REDUCTION OF THE FEAR OF CRIME IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HOME SECURITY FOR ELDERLY AND VULNERABLE VICTIMS OF BURGLARY.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window