THE FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS, NEWPORT, ISLE OF WIGHT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance Christian faith and to assist Parochial Church Council to maintain, repair, restore, preserve, improve, beautify and reconstruct for the public benefit the fabric of the church of Newport Minster. No other grants made.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 27 January 2000: Standard registration
- 24 October 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 October 2011: Funds transferred to 1133165 THE FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS...
- FRIENDS OF NEWPORT MINSTER (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS, NEWPORT, ISLE OF WIGHT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.20k | £115.35k | £254.27k | £385.82k | £208.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.18k | £62.44k | £298.32k | £386.87k | £202.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 23 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 22 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 28 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 12 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 28 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 17 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS, NEWPORT, ISLE OF WIGHT ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS, ORGAN AND OTHER CHATTELS AND TO ASSIST THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS, NEWPORT, ISLE OF WIGHT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window