Financial history NDC TRUST

Charity Number: 1073445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £15.60k £15.60k £15.60k £15.00k £15.20k
Total expenditure £29.82k £54.80k £33.65k £39.50k £49.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A