BERNARD AND JOYCE COLEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coaching facilities to young sportsmen and young sportswomen. Donations to similar sporting charities and grants to sporting clubs and associations. Grants to medical services and to youth projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£507,419
Donations and legacies | £502.14k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.28k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£55,512
Raising funds | £2.74k | |
Charitable activities | £52.77k | |
Other | £0 |
-£36 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £52.77k | |
Retained for future use | £451.91k |
People

1 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 May 1999: Standard registration
- BERNARD COLEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- BERNARD COLEMAN TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Robert Cundy | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ARNOLD ISAACSON | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE FAIRCLOUGH | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JAMES FAIRCLOUGH | Trustee | 06 November 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.78k | £175.66k | £4.37k | £9.14k | £507.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.94k | £127.53k | £49.59k | £33.08k | £55.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £502.14k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.28k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £346.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £52.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £807 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £463.79k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £514.21k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH NOVEMBER 1998, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 27TH APRIL 1999 AND 25 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS, WHO ARE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF MINDS AND, WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THAT OBJECT, TO PROVIDE FUNDS AND TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH PUPILS TO PLAY CRICKET OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AND TO PARTICIPATE IN PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT GENERALLY THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PERSONS, AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS. (B) THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (1) THE INCREASE OF THEIR KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ANY MATTERS OF HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL, AESTHETIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST; (11) THE PROMOTION, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND DRAMA IN ALL ITS ASPECTS; AND (111) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, AWARDS AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SUCH AS SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, ORCHESTRAS, CHOIRS, THEATRES AND OPERAS HOUSES. (C) THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY IN NEED AND THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BY; (1) GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; (11) COUNSELLING OR OTHER PRACTICAL ADVICE; AND (111) MAKING GRANTS OR PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO NURSING HOMES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WHOSE CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDE THE RELIEF OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS AND DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Gladstone Road
ASHTEAD
Surrey
KT21 2NS
- Phone:
- 07714850788
- Email:
- stewie2506@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window