THE PHILADELPHIA TRUST IN EASTERN EUROPE

Charity number: 1076936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The furtherance of the message of Gods Grace throughout Central and Eastern Europe. To support Christians throughout the same region through visitation and service as they require. To run and assist others in running camps for Christians and non Christians. To support the work of a number of churches who are based in Hungary, Czechia, Romania, Ukraine and Poland.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £183,445
Total expenditure: £173,095

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cardiff
  • Czech Republic
  • Hungary
  • Moldova
  • Poland
  • Romania
  • Slovakia
  • Ukraine

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE PHILADELPHIA TRUST (Working name)
  • TEH PHILADELPHIA TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Baldwin Trustee 24 March 2023
None on record
Zackery Whitehouse Trustee 24 March 2023
None on record
Frances Mary Orr Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Bryan Richard Jenkins Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
Abe Samuel Trustee 10 June 2017
Friends of Vellore UK
Received: On time
DEREK FORD Trustee 01 January 1993
CHRISTIAN MISSIONS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN MISSIONS CHARITABLE TRUST UK
Recently registered
Paul Thomas Trustee 01 January 1993
REFLECT COMMUNITY CHURCH
LLANDAFF NORTH GOSPEL HALL
Received: On time
ROGER JOHN BRIND OBE Trustee 01 January 1993
LLANDAFF NORTH GOSPEL HALL
Received: On time
MARK BARTLETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.91k £39.45k £23.60k £338.66k £183.45k
Total expenditure £29.18k £35.18k £21.34k £339.97k £173.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 December 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 December 2023 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 CLOS ENFYS
CAERPHILLY
CF83 1SB
Phone:
02920885142