ALZHEIMER'S FOUNDATION FOR RESEARCH INTO ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY OF THE FOUNDATION IS TO PROMOTE RESEARCH LEADING TO A CURE FOR ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. THE CHARITY MEETS ITS AIMS AND OBJECTIVES BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ORGANSIATIONS THAT FUND AND PROMOTE RESEARCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 1999: Standard registration
- ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON MORRIS | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Patrick Lynch | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Alex Hyde-Smith | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.74k | £391.69k | £32.52k | £108.36k | £309.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.65k | £44.77k | £126.09k | £116.24k | £267.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 23RD OCTOBER 1998, SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED ON THE 21ST APRIL 1999. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAR 2003 as amended on 12 Mar 2025 as amended on 12 Mar 2025 as amended on 12 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
2.1 The Charity's objects (“The Objects”) are (a) The promotion of research leading to the cure for Alzheimer's disease and other dementias and the publication of the useful results of such research. (b) The education of the public concerning the early detection, treatment and control of Alzheimer's disease and other dementias and the promotion of improved care for patients suffering from Alzheimer's disease and other dementias. (c) The promotion of such charitable objects concerned with medical research and therapeutic or palliative care as the Trustees shall, in their absolute discretion, determine.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alzheimers Society
43-44 Crutched Friars
LONDON
EC3N 2AE
- Phone:
- 02074235136
- Email:
- governance@alzheimers.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window