THE UNITED KINGDOM COMMITTEE FOR UNICEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UNICEF is the world's leading organisation working for children. UNICEF works in partnership with families, local communities, partners and governments in over 190 countries and territories to help every child realise their full potential. UNICEF UK raises funds for UNICEF's emergency and development work around the world and advocates for lasting change for children worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£160,850,000
Donations and legacies | £149.27m | |
Charitable activities | £2.68m | |
Other trading activities | £14.00k | |
Investments | £983.00k | |
Other | £7.91m |
Total expenditure:
£160,393,000
Raising funds | £34.08m | |
Charitable activities | £119.92m | |
Other | £6.40m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £417,064 from 15 government contract(s) and £2,546,000 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £40.47m | |
Charitable expenditure | £119.92m | |
Retained for future use | £457.00k |
People

358 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 33 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 6 |
£90k to £100k | 10 |
£120k to £130k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Angola
- Bangladesh
- Belize
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- Eritrea
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Guinea
- Haiti
- Honduras
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mauritania
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Syria
- Tanzania
- Tunisia
- Vietnam
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 26 November 1998: Standard registration
- 24 February 2017: Funds received from 1125250 THE M M B FOUNDATION
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
- 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1143457 THE LYCETT HUMANITARIAN TRUST
- 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
- 07 June 2023: Funds received from 1038063 SKCV CHILDREN'S TRUST (UK)
- 24 January 2024: Funds received from 268645 MRS S L CHAMBERS' CHARITABLE TRUST
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1103475 CENTRAL RELIEF FUND
- UNICEF UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shatish Damodar Dasani | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Dafydd Ellis | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Francis | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Zamila Skingsley | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ferguson | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Elizabeth Atkinson | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Charles Hawkes | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Usama Anmar Al-Qassab | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SEAN CARNEY | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Davis | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Alex Connock | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.39m | £109.37m | £141.82m | £179.50m | £160.85m | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.51m | £109.28m | £139.67m | £176.53m | £160.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £526.89k | £190.19k | £508.48k | £436.25k | £417.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.41m | £3.56m | £2.47m | £5.66m | £2.55m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £90.81m | £102.08m | £133.81m | £168.87m | £149.27m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £284.71k | £298.00k | £320.00k | £91.00k | £14.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.28m | £1.40m | £1.91m | £2.15m | £2.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £47.26k | £20.00k | £4.00k | £198.00k | £983.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £7.97m | £5.57m | £5.78m | £8.19m | £7.91m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £6.71m | £4.73m | £6.82m | £6.73m | £7.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £64.52m | £75.35m | £106.20m | £140.60m | £119.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £28.33m | £29.83m | £27.46m | £28.36m | £34.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.24m | £0 | £1.18m | £1.20m | £1.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £56.39m | £0 | £99.45m | £133.50m | £110.94m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £7.67m | £4.10m | £6.01m | £7.57m | £6.40m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.62m | £2.25m | £1.81m | £1.57m | £1.41m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £33.23m | £31.66m | £39.31m | £44.88m | £40.96m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £32.32m | £30.28m | £35.34m | £37.69m | £33.16m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/06/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2016 as amended on 27 Jun 2018 as amended on 19 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS FOR CHILDREN (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND OTHER RELEVANT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS, AND OTHER RELEVANT INTERNATIONAL AND REGIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS INSTRUMENTS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; 2) TO FURTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR CHILDREN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD INCLUDING WORK THROUGH FAMILIES AND THEIR COMMUNITIES FOR: I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND NEED; II) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; III) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF, AND PROVISION FOR, HEALTH; AND IV) THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN WHO ARE VULNERABLE TO EXPLOITATION AND ABUSE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unicef UK
1 Westfield Avenue
LONDON
E20 1HZ
- Phone:
- 03003305580
- Email:
- supportercare@unicef.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window