HORSHAM YMCA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides sporting and leisure facilities for young people in Horsham and the surrounding areas, and also a range of other community based activities in Horsham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 February 1999: Standard registration
- 19 June 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 19 June 2015: Funds transferred to 1079570 YMCA DOWNSLINK GROUP
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 08/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £444.16k | £86.94k | £108.02k | £82.31k | £114.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £519.86k | £88.61k | £108.76k | £127.06k | £177.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 September 2014 | 27 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 20 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | 20 February 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 05 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 05 March 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 04 February 2013 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 04 February 2013 | 280 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/06/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM 2) TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES 5) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window