CHAI-LIFELINE CANCER CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of persons suffering from cancer, and their families, within the Jewish community.To prevent sickness by promoting good health care and the provision of education and screening programmes for persons within the Jewish commumity, whether suffering from cancer or not.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,005,882
Donations and legacies | £3.82m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £186.02k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,859,885
Raising funds | £641.05k | |
Charitable activities | £3.22m | |
Other | £0 |
£385,778 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £641.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.22m | |
Retained for future use | £146.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £641.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.22m | |
Retained for future use | £531.78k |
People

31 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Hackney
- Leeds City
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Redbridge
- Salford City
- Southend-on-sea
- Wandsworth
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 January 2000: Standard registration
- 23 February 2022: Funds received from 803574 THE DAVID AND LINDA SCHNEIDERMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
- 12 December 2022: Funds received from 269087 THE PAT AND CHARLES SONABEND CHARITABLE TRUST
- 12 December 2024: Funds received from 1107690 JUDY APPLEMAN FOUNDATION
- 07 May 2025: Funds received from 208540 JEWISH ASSOCIATION FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED
- CHAI CANCER CARE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE HAGER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rafael Aryeh Saville | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
LEON SHELLEY | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HERTZ | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Leah Dorothy Maurice | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lawrence Segal | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADRIAN TOOKMAN | Trustee | 03 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LESLEY ZUCKERBROD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.60m | £4.44m | £3.67m | £4.40m | £4.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48m | £2.60m | £3.01m | £3.36m | £3.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.58m | £4.28m | £3.65m | £4.33m | £3.82m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £26.61k | £26.39k | £21.41k | £69.88k | £186.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £132.44k | £6.41k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £402.00k | £158.61k | £138.54k | £701.48k | £162.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.74m | £2.18m | £2.54m | £2.75m | £3.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £747.12k | £416.09k | £473.49k | £612.61k | £641.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.81k | £14.12k | £18.31k | £23.39k | £18.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £6.98k | £1.33k | £17.67k | £30.41k | £17.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.04m | £4.90m | £4.76m | £4.68m | £4.58m | |
|
Long-term investments | £463.82k | £364.52k | £4.61m | £4.88m | £6.50m | |
|
Other assets | £3.99m | £6.07m | £2.66m | £3.32m | £2.30m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £238.19k | £231.62k | £271.02k | £324.55k | £293.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/09/1998 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT SUCH PURPOSES BEING CHARITABLE IN LAW AS WILL PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES FROM THE JEWISH COMMUNITY AND WILL PREVENT SICKNESS BY PROMOTING GOOD HEALTH CARE AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND SCREENING PROGRAMMES FOR PERSONS FROM THE JEWISH COMMUNITY WHETHER CANCER SUFFERERS OR NOT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chai Cancer Care
142-146 Great North Way
LONDON
NW4 1EH
- Phone:
- 02082022211
- Email:
- info@chaicancercare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window