Financial history SEDBERGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1080672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.90m £17.88m £21.95m £25.45m £26.95m
Total expenditure £18.30m £18.73m £21.45m £24.55m £26.34m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.03m £555.17k £18.65k £16.61k £16.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.50m £1.12m £533.00k £1.20m £1.03m
Income - Other trading activities £630.00k £897.00k £1.40m £2.10m £1.84m
Income - Charitable activities £15.68m £15.80m £19.96m £21.90m £23.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £53.00k £33.00k £41.00k £233.00k £387.00k
Income - Other £31.00k £33.00k £18.00k £16.00k £46.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £200.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.22m £17.65m £19.93m £22.45m £24.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.08m £1.08m £1.52m £2.10m £2.01m
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £13.00k £26.00k £19.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £22.00k £23.00k £24.00k £231
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0