CHESTER AID TO THE HOMELESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chester Aid To The Homeless provides accomodation and related support services to homeless individuals in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 25 February 1999: Standard registration
- 21 January 2016: Funds received from 1084055 CHESTER LODGINGS AND SUPPORT PROVIDERS
- CATH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Hall | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Rosenbloom | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Edwards | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
sandra Worger | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Melia | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Caroll | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil David Wallace | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julia Davies | Trustee | 26 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FREDRICK CHARLES ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.96k | £535.87k | £353.97k | £285.68k | £351.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350.74k | £351.46k | £365.76k | £369.12k | £392.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £298.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £234.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £175.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £351.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON THE 5TH FEB. 2004
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS OR SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL INFIRMITY OR WHO BY REASON OF ADVERSE CIRCUMSTANCES, ILL-HEALTH OR BY BEING A DISCHARGED OFFENDER ARE IN NEED OF HELP IN ACQUIRING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE, THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HOSTELS AND RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND TO ENABLE THESE PERSONS TO DEVELOP AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chester Aid to the Homeless
The Bluecoat Building
Upper Northgate Street
CHESTER
CH1 4EE
- Phone:
- 01244506877
- Email:
- info@cath.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window