Financial history DALLAM SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1073313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.73k £1.76k £1.80k £1.84k £1.84k
Total expenditure £1.73k £1.76k £1.80k £1.84k £1.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A