TRAUMA CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trauma CareÔÇÖ is a registered charity whose principal remit is 2 deliver education & training across the whole spectrum of injuries. Trauma is the most common cause of death in patients in the first 4 decades of life. For each death there are 2-3 people with significant permanent injuries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Laura Cottey | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Timothy Coats | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Griffiths | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Willis | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Tovey | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Burnell | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl LEDBURY | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Greaves | Trustee | 12 November 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.82k | £46.62k | £156.23k | £286.32k | £335.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.40k | £31.54k | £139.51k | £268.31k | £398.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF TRAUMA CARE. 2) TO PROVIDE TREATMENT CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO ALL THOSE WHO REQUIRE MEDICAL TREATMENT. 3) TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO ALL AREAS OF TRAUMA HEALTHCARE AND TRADITIONAL MEDICAL SYSTEMS AND REMEDIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND MATTERS DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY RELATED THERE TO AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Group First Ltd
Suite 109
12A Mead Way
Padiham
BURNLEY
Lancashi
- Phone:
- 01254943158
- Email:
- admin@traumacare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window