NORTH NORFOLK RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to provide the opportunity of riding in North Norfolk for disabled adults and children who might benefit in their general health and well being. There is no charge but donations welcome. We provide riding for 9 adults and 15 children on two mornings a week in termtime. We are always looking for volunteers to help with the riding and welcome new riders if we have availability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 January 1999: Standard registration
- 10 September 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 September 2020: Funds transferred to 1181676 WORSTEAD & DISTRICT RIDING FOR THE DISABLED
- NORTH NORFOLK RDA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.60k | £9.78k | £37.57k | £7.56k | £8.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.30k | £6.22k | £17.73k | £6.12k | £9.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 16 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 16 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE-DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE NORTH NORFOLK AREA
Area of benefit
NORTH NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window